WV HB4486 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
10.0pt;color:black'>The purpose of this bill is to terminate the Behavioral Health Severance and Business Privilege Tax; to specify the effective date of this termination; to establish the method of payment of outstanding refund claims; to generate a replacement revenue stream by changing the durable medical goods sales tax exemption to home users only; to specify the effective date of this amendment; to provide the method of claiming this exemption; and to provide definitions for clarification.
Title
Terminating the Behavioral Health Severance and Business Privilege Tax
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/2 |
2016-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/1 |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Similar To) 2016-05-13 - Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 9i | Amended Code | Citation Text |