WV HB4485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reorganizing and redesignating the Department of Military Affairs and Public Safety as the Department of Homeland Security
Title
Reorganizing and redesignating the Department of Military Affairs and Public Safety as the Department of Homeland Security
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB586 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 158, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 1 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5F | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |