WV HB4477 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-14 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-14 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Summary
Relating to payment of GED exam fees
Title
Relating to payment of GED exam fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-14 | Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void | |
2008-04-08 | Chapter 76, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 38) | |
2008-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-27 | To Finance | |
2008-02-27 | To Finance | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 189) | |
2008-02-26 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 188) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | With title amendment, do pass | |
2008-02-08 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-08 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-08 | Originating in House Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB161 (Same As) 2008-02-29 - Recommitted to Finance on 2nd reading
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4477&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |