WV HB4467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide additional classroom social/emotional and academic support for first and second grade pupils by requiring an early childhood classroom assistant teacher in first and second grade classrooms that have more than 12 pupils. Note that requirements currently exist in State Board Policy 2510 for pre-kindergarten and kindergarten classrooms with more than 10 pupils to have an early childhood classroom assistant teacher and these provisions would be added to the statute in this bill. The school aid formula allowance for service personnel is amended to increase the number of state funded positions per 1,000 students in net enrollment to provide state funding for the added positions. Finally, A new section of code is added which requires early childhood classroom assistant teachers to exercise authority and control over students such as required of a teacher, but only in instances enumerated by the principal and excluding suspensions, expulsions and performing instructional duties as a teacher.Â
Title
Requiring early childhood classroom assistant teacher in certain grade levels and enrollment levels in said grade levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 339) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Education |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 339) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-03 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-31 | House | To Education then Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |