WV HB4462 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to mandate the presentation of an actuarial report to the Legislature’s Joint Committee on Pensions and Retirement regarding active deferred retirement option plans (DROPs) every five years.
Title
Relating to Deferred Retirement Option Plan evaluations
Sponsors
Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Edward Evans [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] |
Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 350) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 220) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 220) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 350) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Pensions then Finance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 220) |
2022-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/21/22 |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-31 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB532 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22 | 25a | Amended Code | Citation Text |