WV HB4461 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to consolidate all administrative fees collected by the agency into the already created “Tax Administration Services Fund” in W. Va. Code §11-10-27 and remove the cap of $3 million on the fund in the interests of efficient administration and relief on the general revenue fund expenditures of the agency.
Title
Relating to the consolidation of all administrative fees collected by the agency into the existing “Tax Administration Services Fund”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 365) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 364) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 141) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 364) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 141) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 278, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 365) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 364) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 141) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | To House Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-31 | House | To Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - To Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |