WV HB4453 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the eligibility requirements for private investigator and security guard licensure
Title
Expanding the eligibility requirements for private investigator and security guard licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 117) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 117) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-22 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-22 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 18 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 18 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 18 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |