WV HB4453 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to correct an error in this section by changing “not” to “or “in §9-2-13(d).
Title
Relating to judicial review of contested cases under the West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources Board of Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 409) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 409) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 237) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |