WV HB4445 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the provisions of the code addressing the adoption of instructional resources. In furtherance of this objective the bill includes the following provisions; (1) Defining “instructional resources”; (2) requiring publishers of electronic text books to file certain statements with the State Superintendent of Schools concerning wholesale pricing; (3) providing certain procedures to be taken if a publisher breaches a contract in relation to the provision of instructional resources; (4) prohibiting any county board of education to use instructional resources furnished by a publisher who has not complied with the requirements of the article; (5) providing that supplementary instructional resources do not apply to the provisions of the article; (6) requiring county boards of education to furnish free of charge necessary instructional resources; and (7) prohibiting employees of boards of education to act as sales agents for any provider of instructional resources. The bill also repeals section 9 of the article which addresses persons who provide gifts and bribes in order to influence adoption of instructional resources, which, under current law constitutes a felony. This article has been completely rewritten, and therefore is completely underscored.
Title
Relating to the adoption of instructional educational resources
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. David Perry [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] |
Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. David Evans [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Del. Joe Ellington [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 149) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 149) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | To House Education |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-08 | House | To Education |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 2A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2A | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |