WV HB4445 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the definition of “battery” and “domestic battery” to conform with federal laws as a result of U. S. v. White, 606 F. 3d 144.
Title
Modifying the definition of "battery" and "domestic battery"
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] |
Del. Denise Campbell [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 500) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 110) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 500) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 110) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 3) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 500) |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-03-14 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/13/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/14 |
2014-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 110) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-14 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 2 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |