WV HB4436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify when a minor between the ages of 16 and 18 may be employed by or elected as a member of a volunteer fire department to perform fire fighting functions.
Title
Clarifying when a minor between the ages of 16 and 18 may be employed by or elected as a member of a volunteer fire department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 328) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 321) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 171) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 321) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 171) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 328) |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 321) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 171) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-06 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |