WV HB4435 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Public Service Commission to approve expedited cost recovery of electric utility coal-fired boiler modernization and improvement projects.
Title
Authorizing the Public Service Commission to approve expedited cost recovery of electric utility coal-fired boiler modernization and improvement projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 429) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 429) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 340) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-08 | House | To House Energy |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-08 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |