WV HB4434 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Government Organization
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Government Organization
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit state agencies and local government units from restricting the sale or use of motor vehicles based on the energy sources used to power the vehicles.
Title
Relating to restrictions on use or sale of motor vehicles based on power source
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Government Organization |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Government Organization |
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 64) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 14 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 14 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |