WV HB4433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to deeds of trust
Title
Relating to deeds of trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 747) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 550) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 550) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 747) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 550) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 315) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |