WV HB4422 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit permanent endowment funds of cemeteries to invest their principal in government bonds, and corporate bonds that have been rated A or above.
Title
Permitting permanent endowment funds of cemeteries to invest their principal in certain government bonds, and corporate bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 193) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 193) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 193) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-05 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |