WV HB4420 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make certain clarifications and modifications to the eligibility requirements of school bus operators diagnosed with diabetes mellitus requiring insulin.
Title
To modify definitions of school bus operators.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Anthony Paynter [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 375) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 262, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 375) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 122) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-27 | House | To Education |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |