WV HB4414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 279, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 279, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the selection of language and development milestones for the deaf and hard-of-hearing children
Title
Relating to the selection of language and development milestones for the deaf and hard-of-hearing children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 546) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 102) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 102) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 279, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 546) |
2020-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 102) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-20 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-20 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-20 | House | Originating in House Senior, Children, and Family Issues |