WV HB4408 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an online database for school principals employment opportunities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the State Board of Education to develop and implement an online database for the employment of school principals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 279) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateTo Education
2020-02-24SenateTo Education
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-21HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-21HousePassed House (Roll No. 279)
2020-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-21HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-19HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-19HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-17HouseTo House Education
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-17HouseTo Education
2020-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18243New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback