WV HB4404 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 125, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 125, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a mechanism for the regulation and licensing by the Insurance Commissioner of discount medical plan organizations and discount prescription drug plan organizations.
Title
Discount Medical Plan Organizations and Discount Prescription Drug Plan Organizations Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 125, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 449) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 32) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass | |
2008-03-06 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/4/08 | |
2008-03-04 | On second reading to Banking and Insurance | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-04 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Banking and Insurance | |
2008-02-26 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2008-02-26 | To Health and Human Resources then Banking and Insurance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 125) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2008-02-21 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-04 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2008-02-04 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-04 | To Health and Human Resources then Finance | |
2008-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Same As) 2008-02-05 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4404&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |