WV HB4393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 275, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 275, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the managed care tax if the managed care organization receives a rate increase
Title
To increase the managed care tax if the managed care organization receives a rate increase
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. George Miller [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 285) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 285) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 275, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance on 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 285) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-10 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 27 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |