WV HB4380 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Updating the regulatory board review schedule

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating the regulatory board review schedule

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 110) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-07SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 110)
2020-02-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-04HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-03HouseDo pass
2020-01-16HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-16HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-16HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41010Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback