WV HB4377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow county commissions and municipalities to impose their hotel occupancy taxes on hotel and motel rooms regardless of the length of time for which the hotel or motel room is rented. It also provides that the tax is not imposed on rooms rented to government officials on official business who are not reimbursed for the stay. Strike‑throughs indicate language that would be stricken from a heading or the present law, and underscoring indicates new language that would be added.
Title
Eliminating exemption from hotel occupancy taxes on rental of hotel and motel rooms for thirty or more consecutive days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 340) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 261) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 261) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/11/16 |
2016-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 340) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 261) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2016-02-29 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/23 |
2016-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-03 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4430 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - To House Political Subdivisions
SB521 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - To Government Organization
SB521 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 18 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |