WV HB4369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Update the telepsychology compact
Title
Update the telepsychology compact
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] |
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Don Forsht [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 180) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 179) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 86) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 179) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 86) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/22 |
2022-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/9/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-04 | House | To Governor 3/3/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/3/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/3/22 |
2022-02-23 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 180) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 179) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-09 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-09 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 86) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 21A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |