WV HB4360 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain persons from heating, ventilating, and cooling system licensing requirements
Title
Exempting certain persons from heating, ventilating, and cooling system licensing requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 455) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 455) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-23 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Industry and Labor then Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 16 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |