WV HB4355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure by state institutions of higher education of certain information regarding textbooks and digital courseware and certain charges assessed for those items
Title
Relating to the disclosure by state institutions of higher education of certain information regarding textbooks and digital courseware and certain charges assessed for those items
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Riley Keaton [R] | Del. Austin Haynes [R] |
Del. Laura Kimble [R] | Del. Caleb Hanna [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Johnnie Wamsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 603) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 473) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 93) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 473) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 93) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 153, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 603) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 473) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 93) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-24 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-24 | House | To Education |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |