WV HB4351 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 31, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 31, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to improve mine safety in the State of West Virginia by requiring coal mine operators to provide reports to and notify certain entities in the event of an emergency; establishing a mine safety anonymous tip hotline; permitting the Director of the Office of Miners Health, Safety and Training to share information regarding certification suspensions or revocations with other states; requiring a study be conducted regarding mine inspector qualifications, compensation, training and inspections; creating a criminal offense and establishing criminal penalties for providing advance notice of an inspection or an inspectors presence at a mine; requiring operators to conduct substance abuse testing during inspections or investigations upon reasonable suspicion; providing for suspension of mining certificates if substance abuse testing refused; requiring coal mining operators to implement substance abuse screening policy and program for certified persons; requiring substance abuse screening upon preemployment, rehiring or transfer of certified person; providing procedure for board of appeals hearings on certification suspensions and judicial review of board decisions; providing procedure for approval, review, comment and enforcement of mine ventilation plans; increasing the number of days an apprentice must work within sight and sound of mine foreman or experienced miner; requiring methane detectors be maintained in accordance with manufacture specifications; expanding scope of preshift examinations and requiring supplemental examinations in certain instances; increasing the percentage of rock dust to be maintained in coal mines; prescribing actions required to detect and respond to excess methane gas levels in coal mines; prescribing requirements for persons to operate or repair mining machinery; providing for increased training regarding the use of self-contained self-rescue devices; requiring study of and report on the safety of working or traveling in bleeder or gob areas of certain coal mines; and requiring study of and report on education, training and examination associated with certifying miners.
Title
Relating to mine safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 241) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 31, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/10/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/10/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/10/12 | |
2012-03-07 | House Message received | |
2012-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 241) | |
2012-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-06 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-06 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/1/12 | |
2012-03-02 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-03-01 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-01 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | To Energy, Industry and Mining | |
2012-02-29 | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 128) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2012-02-27 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-20 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-17 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-31 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-31 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-31 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1 | 13a | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 1 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 1A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 43a | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 2 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 6 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22A | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 7 | 5a | New Code | See Bill Text |