WV HB4350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Deputy Sheriff Retirement System Act
Title
Relating to the Deputy Sheriff Retirement System Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Do pass with title amendment, but first to Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4136 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - To House Pensions and Retirement
SB654 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
SB654 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 14D | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |