WV HB4334 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the requirements for a license to practice as an advanced practice registered nurses and to expand the prescriptive authority that may be granted to advanced practice registered nurses (APRNs). The bill repeals separate provisions relating to nurse-midwives because these provisions are part of the APRN license requirements. This bill removes the requirement for collaborative relationships with physicians as a continuing requirement of practice, but retains the collaborative relationship requirement for a two-year period as a prerequisite to qualify for prescriptive authority. The bill permits advanced practice registered nurses to prescribe limited supplies of certain controlled substances. The bill permits the signature of an advanced practice registered nurse to have the same force and effect as that of a physician insofar as patient care documentation is concerned. The bill removes certain notifications. The bill permits certain fees to be set by rule.
Title
Clarifying the requirements for a license to practice as an advanced practice registered nurse and expanding prescriptive authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 505) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 235) (Y: 66 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 221) (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 589) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 235) (Y: 66 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 221) (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 505) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 589) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Floor Title amendment adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Government Organization |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 235) |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-26 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 221) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/26 |
2016-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-17 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-01-29 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-29 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2016-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To Health and Human Resources
SB519 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - To Health and Human Resources
SB519 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 7a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 7b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 7c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 15 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15d | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 15e | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 1 | 2333 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
48 | 1 | 2334 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
48 | 31 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 9 | 404 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |