WV HB4333 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sunset of the Board of Hearing-Aid Dealers and Fitters
Title
Relating to the sunset of the Board of Hearing-Aid Dealers and Fitters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 547) (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 670) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 160) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Lindsay amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 159) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 73) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 670) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 160) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Lindsay amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 159) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 73) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 210, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 547) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 670) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report received-House |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-08 | House | To conference |
2022-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | House appointed conferees: Foster, Smith, Young |
2022-03-08 | House | House agreed to conference |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Takubo, Woodrum, Plymale |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2022-02-25 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 160) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Takubo floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Lindsay amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 159) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Takubo floor amendment reported |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 73) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 26 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 32 | 10a | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 32 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 32 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |