WV HB4331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
West Virginia’s Urban Mass Transportation Authority Act
Title
West Virginia’s Urban Mass Transportation Authority Act
Sponsors
Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] |
Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Moore Capito [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 576) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 575) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 411) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 411) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 248) (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 247) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 575) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 411) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 411) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 248) (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 247) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 166, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 576) |
2022-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 575) |
2022-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 411) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 411) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 248) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 247) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/17/22 |
2022-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |