WV HB4329 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require pawnbrokers to provide certain information to law-enforcement agencies. The bill provides a mechanism to provide the information through a third-party database available on the Internet.
Title
Requiring pawnbrokers to providing certain information to law-enforcement agencies
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] |
Del. Riley Moore [R] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] |
Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 47) (Y: 14 N: 81 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary on 3rd reading |
2018-02-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 47) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-02 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |