WV HB4324 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 209, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 209, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To update collaborative pharmacy practice agreements
Title
To update collaborative pharmacy practice agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 406) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 405) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 346) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 346) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 405) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 346) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 346) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 209, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 406) |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 405) |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 346) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 346) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 64) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |