WV HB4324 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that the employment of individuals by municipal paid fire departments under civil service need not be a resident of the municipality or the county in which he or she seeks to become a member of the paid fire department; and that if there are not enough eligible applicants to certify a list of three, then the appointing officer may appoint a qualified individual to fill the position.
Title
Relating to the employment of individuals by municipal paid fire departments under civil service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 544) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 544) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate reconsidered title amendment (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/7/18 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 165) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-26 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 15 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |