WV HB4320 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to natural immunity or antibodies to any illness to be treated as equal or better to vaccine induced immunity
Title
Relating to natural immunity or antibodies to any illness to be treated as equal or better to vaccine induced immunity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 331) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Government Organization then Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 331) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |