WV HB4309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to restrict the sale and trade of dextromethorphan. The bill sets age limits. The bill defines terms. The bill establishes penalties. The bill preempts local ordinances and requires rulemaking.
Title
Restricting the sale and trade of dextromethorphan
Sponsors
Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Brad White [R] | Del. Daryl Cowles [R] |
Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 235) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 235) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-26 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 12 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 12 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60A | 4 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |