WV HB4309 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the criminal penalties for conviction of the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person, protected person or incapacitated person.
Title
Increasing criminal penalties for conviction of certain offenses of financial exploitation of an elderly person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 592) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 358) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 82) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 592) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 358) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 82) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 592) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 358) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 82) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | Do pass |
2016-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Senior Citizen Issues |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-27 | House | To Senior Citizen Issues then Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7J | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7J | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7J | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7J | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7J | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7J | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 29b | Amended Code | Citation Text |