WV HB4299 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the intentional interference with election processes and creating associated criminal penalties
Title
To prohibit the intentional interference with election processes and creating associated criminal penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 236) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 158) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 158) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 114, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/22 |
2022-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/9/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/9/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-04 | House | To Governor 3/3/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/3/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/3/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 236) |
2022-02-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 158) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 63) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |