WV HB4295 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To transfer the State Office of the National Flood Insurance Program from the Offices of the Insurance Commissioner to the Division of Emergency Management
Title
To transfer the State Office of the National Flood Insurance Program from the Offices of the Insurance Commissioner to the Division of Emergency Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 404) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 355) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 121) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 355) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 121) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 160, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 404) |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Government Organization Committee title amendment adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Banking & Insurance title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 355) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Government Organization Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Banking & Insurance Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass with amends and title amend, but first to Government Organization |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Government Organization |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 121) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-02 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2022-01-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2022-01-20 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-20 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 20B | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |