WV HB4293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting mass mailing of absentee ballots
Title
Prohibiting mass mailing of absentee ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 330) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 330) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendments pending |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |