WV HB4289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the amount of income that may be earned by a person receiving a municipal disability pension before an offset of benefits is required. The bill also provides an automatic increase to that limit when the minimum wage increases. The bill also eliminates language that is unnecessary and without practical effect. This bill was recommended for introduction by the Municipal Pensions Oversight Board.
Title
Relating to disability pensions of municipal employees
Sponsors
Del. Ron Walters [R] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Edward Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 206) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 206) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 206) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-14 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-24 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |