WV HB4270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for timely payment of moneys owed from oil and natural gas production; to establish interest penalties for certain late payments; to require specified information be remitted with such payments; to require quarterly reporting of production data to Department of Environmental Protection for horizontal wells; and to provide for rule-making authority.
Title
Providing for the timely payment of moneys owed from oil and natural gas production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 434) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 434) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 434) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Judiciary Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | EIM Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 118) |
2018-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Energy |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-24 | House | To Energy then Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 6 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37B | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37B | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37B | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37B | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |