WV HB4268 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide an exception to waste and trespass for certain oil and natural gas use and development to encourage the efficient economic development of oil and natural gas resources. The bill provides that use and development of oil and gas mineral property that has been consented to by three fourths of the oil and gas owners is permissible, is not waste, and is not a trespass. The bill provides that cotenants and operators are not liable for damages for the development and use of the property if they pay nonconsenting cotenants in accordance with either of two defined options and report and reserve interests for unknown or unlocatable tenants. The bill provides a method to determine certain leasehold and contractual terms, including review and determination by the Oil and Gas Conservation Commission in limited circumstances. The bill provides for the creation of a fund to accept deposits of reserved interests for unknown or unlocatable cotenants which is administered by the State Treasurer as provided and in conjunction with the Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. The bill provides that after a specified time, the administrator may transfer the unclaimed funds to the Oil and Gas Reclamation Fund for the plugging of oil and gas wells. The bill provides for penalties for noncompliance as part of the Uniform Unclaimed Property Act and provides for rule making authority by the State Treasurer regarding the created fund and by the Oil and Gas Conservation Commission. The bill provides certain protections for surface owners where oil and natural gas are owned by a nonconsenting cotenant and provides liability protection for nonconsenting cotenants with respect to development of oil and natural gas. Finally, the bill provides that its provisions are severable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Co-tenancy Modernization and Majority Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 302) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Romano Floor amendments #2 rejected (Roll No. 298) (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment #3 rejected (Roll No. 297) (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 117) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 108) (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 107) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 106) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 105) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 104) (Y: 40 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseChapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/9/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-06HouseTo Governor 3/6/18 - House Journal
2018-03-06HouseTo Governor 3/6/18
2018-03-06SenateTo Governor 3/6/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 302)
2018-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate title amendment
2018-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-03SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-03SenateFloor Title amendment adopted
2018-03-03SenateJudiciary Title amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2018-03-03SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 313)
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-03SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRomano Floor amendments #2 rejected (Roll No. 298)
2018-03-02SenateRomano Floor amendment #3 rejected (Roll No. 297)
2018-03-02SenateRomano Floor amendment #1 withdrawn by unanimous consent
2018-03-02SenateOjeda Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-01SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-28SenateReported do pass, with title amendment
2018-02-21SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateTo Energy, Industry and Mining
2018-02-16SenateTo Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-16SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 117)
2018-02-15HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-14HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 108)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 107)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 106)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 105)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 104)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-13HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-12HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-01-31HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-31HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseTo House Energy
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-24HouseTo Energy then Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22C93Amended CodeCitation Text
22C94Amended CodeCitation Text
3772Amended CodeCitation Text
37B11New CodeSee Bill Text
37B12New CodeSee Bill Text
37B13New CodeSee Bill Text
37B14New CodeSee Bill Text
37B15New CodeSee Bill Text
37B16New CodeSee Bill Text
37B17New CodeSee Bill Text
37B21New CodeSee Bill Text
37B22New CodeSee Bill Text
37B23New CodeSee Bill Text
37B24New CodeSee Bill Text
37B25New CodeSee Bill Text
37B26New CodeSee Bill Text
37B27New CodeSee Bill Text
37B28New CodeSee Bill Text
37B29New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4268&year=2018&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4268%20intr.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=4268
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4268%20SUB.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=4268
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4268%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=4268
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4268%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=4268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00104.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00106.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00108.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00117.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-02-0297.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-02-0298.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-03-0313.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00302.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback