WV HB4268 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify reduction of the amount of severance tax proceeds dedicated to the West Virginia Infrastructure General Obligation Debt Service Fund.
Title
Relating to dedication of severance tax proceeds to the West Virginia Infrastructure General Obligation Debt Service Fund
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 70) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2016-01-26 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-26 | House | To Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB351 (Similar To) 2016-05-13 - Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
HB4485 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - To House Education
HB4485 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 9D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15A | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |