WV HB4265 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize an alternative means of payment of principal and interest on bonds owned by the United States or any governmental agency or department thereof.
Title
Relating to payment by the West Virginia Municipal Bond Commission or state sinking fund commission or the governing body issuing the bonds
Sponsors
Del. Ron Walters [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Denny Canterbury [R] | Del. John McCuskey [R] |
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] | Del. David Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 388) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 139) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 388) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 139) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) |
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 388) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2016-02-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-23 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 139) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-01-25 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-25 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2016-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB340 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 2A | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 3 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 16 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 27 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |