WV HB4264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Change name of Glenville State College to “Glenville State University”
Title
Change designation of Glenville State College to “Glenville State University”
Sponsors
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Edward Evans [D] | Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Laura Kimble [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 200) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 200) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 199) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 196) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 195) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 200) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 199) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 196) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 195) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-23 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Governor 2/22/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-22 | House | To Governor 2/22/22 |
2022-02-23 | House | To Governor 2/22/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-22 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 200) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 200) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 199) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 196) |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 195) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 2/18/22 |
2022-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-19 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-19 | House | To Education |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |