WV HB4252 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce copay cap on insulin and devices
Title
To reduce copay cap on insulin and devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 504) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 44) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 44) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 504) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2022-01-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 44) |
2022-01-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 59 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |