WV HB4242 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Labor to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Child Labor
Title
Authorizing the Division of Labor to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Child Labor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 373) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 167) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 167) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 373) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 373) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 167) |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 166) |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-03 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2022-01-18 | House | To House Workforce Development |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-18 | House | To Workforce Development then Government Organization |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB403 (Similar To) 2022-01-17 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |