WV HB4228 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create transportation network companies; to provide definitions; to declare not common carriers; to require permits; to require an agent for service of process ; to provide for fare collection, identification, and electronic receipts; to require financial responsibility and disclosure thereof; to allow automobile insurers to exclude certain coverages; to define the relationship between drivers and transportation network companies; to prohibit alcohol or drug use; to provide requirements for drivers; to require vehicle inspections; to prohibit street hails, cash trips and discrimination; to require customer records to be kept and to prohibit local entity taxes or licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transportation network companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-05 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 296) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 296) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 374) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 373) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 237) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 237) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 81) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 80) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 71) (Y: 27 N: 65 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13HouseChapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
2016-03-15HouseApproved by Governor 3/15/16
2016-03-15HouseApproved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal
2016-03-15SenateApproved by Governor 3/15/16 - Senate Journal
2016-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/9/16
2016-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal
2016-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/16 - Senate Journal
2016-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2016-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2016-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2016-03-05SenateEffective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 296)
2016-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 296)
2016-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2016-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-03-04HouseEffective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 374)
2016-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 373)
2016-03-04HouseHouse received Senate message
2016-03-01SenateSenate requests House to concur
2016-03-01SenateEffective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 237)
2016-03-01SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 237)
2016-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-01SenateOn 3rd reading
2016-02-29SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2016-02-29SenateRead 2nd time
2016-02-28SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/28/16
2016-02-28SenateOn 2nd reading
2016-02-27SenateRead 1st time
2016-02-27SenateOn 1st reading
2016-02-26SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2016-02-16SenateTo Judiciary
2016-02-16SenateTo Judiciary
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2016-02-16SenateHouse Message received
2016-02-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-02-15HouseEffective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 81)
2016-02-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 80)
2016-02-15HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-15HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2016-02-12HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 71)
2016-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-12HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2016-02-11HouseRead 1st time
2016-02-11HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2016-02-10HouseBy substitute, do pass
2016-02-02HouseTo House Finance
2016-02-02HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2016-01-22HouseTo House Roads and Transportation
2016-01-22HouseIntroduced in House
2016-01-22HouseTo Roads and Transportation then Finance
2016-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB324 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - To Transportation and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17291New CodeSee Bill Text
172910New CodeSee Bill Text
172911New CodeSee Bill Text
172912New CodeSee Bill Text
172913New CodeSee Bill Text
172914New CodeSee Bill Text
172915New CodeSee Bill Text
172916New CodeSee Bill Text
172917New CodeSee Bill Text
172918New CodeSee Bill Text
172919New CodeSee Bill Text
17292New CodeSee Bill Text
17293New CodeSee Bill Text
17294New CodeSee Bill Text
17295New CodeSee Bill Text
17296New CodeSee Bill Text
17297New CodeSee Bill Text
17298New CodeSee Bill Text
17299New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4228&year=2016&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4228%20intr.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4228
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4228%20SUB.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4228
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4228%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4228
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4228%20SUB%20ENR%20OFFICIAL.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4228
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00071.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00080.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00081.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/03-01-0237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00373.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00374.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0296.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback