WV HB4228 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to repeal or remove certain portions of education-related statutes that have expired or requires or provides for funding. The bill repeals the authorization for county boards of education with an excess levy in effect prior to Better Schools Amendment to propose an additional excess levy not exceeding one hundred percent and a period of five years. The bill repeals an expired pilot program for the delivery of leftover foods from schools and penal institutions. The bill repeals expired provisions for review of system of education performance audits. The bill repeals an expired requirement for audit of state board policies. The bill repeals the library media improvement grant program. The bill repeals an expired requirement for study on school equity. The bill repeals an expired provision governing county board meetings. The bill repeals adult literacy education program financed, in part, by a voluntary state income tax return check-off. The bill repeals the appropriation and allocation, up to $7 million, due to the increase in local share to Teachers Retirement System. The bill repeals the incentive for administrative efficiency in public schools and its associated funding to the county boards of education. The bill repeals requirement for county boards of education to file request schedule for funds to which they may be entitled. The bill repeals the better school buildings amendment and associated funding to county boards of education. The bill repeals an expired study on training, certification, licensure and retraining of teachers. The bill repeals a study of alternative certification programs that was required to be submitted to the Legislative Oversight Commission on Education Accountability by December 31, 2013. The bill repeals the requirement to record and distribute exemplary teaching techniques and its associated bonuses to certain teachers. The bill repeals an expired study on daily planning periods. The bill provides that the State Board of Education need only file a single copy of a proposed rule with the Legislative Oversight Commission. The bill removes the requirement that the State Board of Education contract with an independent agency to evaluate the results of character education and biannual reporting. The bill removes the requirement for semiannual reporting on the effect of increased compulsory attendance age of students and the progress the state and county boards have made in implementing its associated requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing or removing certain portions of education-related statutes that have expired

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 466) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 28) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10HouseChapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
2014-03-14HouseApproved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal
2014-03-31HouseApproved by Governor 3/31/14
2014-03-14SenateApproved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-28HouseTo Governor 3/28/14
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 466)
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2014-03-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 28)
2014-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2014-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2014-03-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2014-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-03-06SenateRead 1st time
2014-03-06SenateImmediate consideration
2014-03-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2014-02-27SenateTo Education
2014-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2014-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 188)
2014-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2014-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2014-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2014-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2014-01-24HouseTo House Finance
2014-01-24HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2014-01-20HouseTo House Education
2014-01-20HouseIntroduced in House
2014-01-20HouseTo Education then Finance
2014-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11816aRepealed CodeCitation Text
18213Amended CodeCitation Text
18217Repealed CodeCitation Text
1825aAmended CodeCitation Text
182E5bRepealed CodeCitation Text
182E7Amended CodeCitation Text
182E8bRepealed CodeCitation Text
182G1Repealed CodeCitation Text
182G2Repealed CodeCitation Text
182G3Repealed CodeCitation Text
18515eRepealed CodeCitation Text
18538Repealed CodeCitation Text
1871Repealed CodeCitation Text
1872Repealed CodeCitation Text
1873Repealed CodeCitation Text
1881aAmended CodeCitation Text
189A14aRepealed CodeCitation Text
189A19Repealed CodeCitation Text
189A6bRepealed CodeCitation Text
189C1Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C2Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C3Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C4Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C5Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C6Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C7Repealed CodeCitation Text
189C8Repealed CodeCitation Text
18A212Amended CodeCitation Text
18A31cRepealed CodeCitation Text
18A31dRepealed CodeCitation Text
18A410bRepealed CodeCitation Text
18A414aRepealed CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback