WV HB4220 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 107, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 107, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Division of Natural Resources to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Prohibitions When Hunting and Trapping.
Title
Authorizing the department of commerce to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. John Overington [R] | Del. Daniel Poling [D] |
Del. Joe Talbott [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 239) (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 238) (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 96) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 238) (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 96) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 107, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-07 | House Message received | |
2012-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 239) | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 238) | |
2012-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-06 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-06 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 10) | |
2012-03-06 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2012-02-23 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-22 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-22 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 96) | |
2012-02-22 | Passed House (Roll No. 95) | |
2012-02-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-22 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-21 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-20 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-17 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-26 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | To House Natural Resources | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-19 | To Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |